IN SB0223 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the medical licensing board of Indiana (board) to investigate and assess civil penalties for specified violations by licensed physicians. Requires the division of consumer protection within the office of the attorney general to forward complaints for specified violations to the board unless certain circumstances are met. Allows a physician who is determined by the board to have committed a violation to appeal the board's determination. Establishes the physician compliance fund consisting of penalties assessed and collected by the board for violations determined by the board through investigations. Specifies reporting requirements that the board is required to make to the National Practitioner Data Bank concerning disciplinary action taken by the board, and prohibits the board from reporting specified administrative penalties.
Title
Medical licensing board investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 149 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 721: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 502: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-27 | House advisors appointed: Dodge, T. Brown and Reske | |
2011-04-27 | House conferees appointed: Crouch and Welch | |
2011-04-26 | Senate advisors appointed: Gard and Simpson | |
2011-04-26 | Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Breaux | |
2011-04-26 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 484: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 2 (Lehe), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-08 | Cosponsors: Reps. Welch, Dodge and Reske | |
2011-02-08 | House sponsor: Rep. Crouch | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Miller |