IN SB0222 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a high school student athlete who has been removed from play because of a suspected concussion or head injury may not return to play until at least 24 hours have passed since the incident. Beginning July 1, 2014, requires football coaches and assistant football coaches who are coaching individuals less than 20 years of age to complete a course concerning player safety and concussions at least once during a two year period. Provides civil immunity for football coaches in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student athlete concussions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 022203 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 022201 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24SenatePublic Law 34
2014-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 459: yeas 94 and nays 2
2014-03-12SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 393: yeas 44 and nays 1
2014-03-11HouseRepresentative McNamara added as conferee
2014-03-11HouseRepresentative McNamara removed as advisor
2014-03-11HouseRepresentative Battles removed as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative VanDenburgh added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Thompson added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative McNamara added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Battles added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Arnold added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Mrvan added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Alting added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Stoops added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Holdman added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 361: yeas 95 and nays 3
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed.
2014-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative McNamara added as cosponsor.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative Battles added as cosponsor.
2014-02-24HouseRepresentative VanDenburgh added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Education
2014-01-30SenateRepresentative Arnold added as sponsor.
2014-01-30SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-30SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 86: yeas 45 and nays 1
2014-01-30SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor.
2014-01-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-28SenateReread second time amended and ordered engrossed
2014-01-28SenateSB 222 Amendment #1 (Holdman), prevailed.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Taylor added as coauthor.
2014-01-27SenateReturned to second reading
2014-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2014-01-24SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Stoops added as third author.
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report; do pass; adopted
2014-01-09SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
2014-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman, Alting

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/222/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/f/5/15f51481/SB0222.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/0/3/9303a623/SB0222.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/7/8/1a78fe31/SB0222.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/a/8/a2a8f51c/SB0222.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/1/a/591acb32/SB0222.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/f/7/4cf7c183/SB0222.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/d/b/5ddb1fcb/SB0222.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/f/2/bbf2a5c3/SB0222.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/6/c/106c708f/SB0222.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/b/e/babea85f/SB0222.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/9/6/249619d5/SB0222.03.ENGS.86.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/e/f/d7ef3be7/SB0222.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/4/2/5942a6c9/SB0222.04.COMH.361.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/f/7/35f72406/SB0222.04.COMH.459.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/0/c/870ca44f/SB0222.04.COMH.393.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback