IN SB0221 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court to impose reasonable monitoring requirements on a person who is issued a restricted driving permit if the person is a habitual traffic violator, and requires a court to impose certain conditions on habitual traffic violators. Provides that a judgment, for purposes of the habitual traffic violator law, includes a judgment from another jurisdiction in which the elements of the offense are substantially similar to the elements of the offense in Indiana. Provides that it is a Class A misdemeanor if a person operates a vehicle or motorized bicycle in violation of a restricted license.
Title
Conditions of hardship licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 28 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-04 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 258: Yeas 48, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2010-03-03 | Senators Lanane and Randolph added as coauthors | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 2 (Walorski), ruled out of order | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 1 (VanHaaften), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. VanHaaften | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senators Wyss and Broden |