IN SB0218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Township homeless assistance. Establishes the low barrier homeless shelter task force. Beginning July 1, 2022: (1) allows a township trustee to place a homeless individual temporarily in a county home or provide temporary township assistance; and (2) requires the township trustees within a county to collaborate and prepare a list of public and private resources available to the homeless population that is distributed and published on the county's Internet web site, if the county has a web site, not later than March 1 of each year. Provides that a person commits the offense of criminal trespass if: (1) the person, who does not have a contractual interest in the property, knowingly or intentionally enters or refuses to leave the property of another person after having been prohibited from entering or asked to leave the property by a law enforcement officer when the property is designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be an unsafe building or premises; or (2) the person knowingly or intentionally enters the property of another person after being denied entry by a court order that has been issued to the person or issued to the general public by conspicuous posting on or around the premises in areas where a person can observe the order when the property has been designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be an unsafe building or premises; unless the person has the written permission of the owner, the owner's agent, an enforcement authority, or a court to come onto the property for purposes of performing maintenance, repair, or demolition. Provides that an individual who harasses another person with the intent to obtain property from the other person commits aggressive harassment, a Class C misdemeanor. Defines "harasses". Repeals the chapter concerning panhandling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Township homeless assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenatePublic Law 75
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 317: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-31SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-30HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Ledbetter C added as cosponsor
2021-03-29HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2021-03-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 92, nays 1
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Bauer M added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Zent added as cosponsor
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-16SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second author
2021-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2021-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/218/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/0/7/9607e966/SB0218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/1/f/e31ff16c/SB0218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/7/c/867cf0c2/SB0218.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/0/d/660d6540/SB0218.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/1/f/ed1f60f6/SB0218.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/d/2/4cd22ab2/SB0218.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/8/7/d28786b3/SB0218.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/3/a/613a6058/SB0218.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/8/7/a5871163/SB0218.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/4/c/6c4c0291/SB0218.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/b/e/52beb054/SB0218.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/7/f/647f8105/SB0218.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/6/3/1363425f/SB0218.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/4/7/6947ddb8/SB0218.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/c/a/c3ca4e1a/SB0218.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/2/42e21039/SB0218.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/0/1/ff01ca8c/SB0218.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/f/9/5ff94317/SB0218.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/d/2/3cd2dc2f/SB0218.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/1/4/4514cffb/SB0218.127_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/c/4/aec4a5b8/SB0218.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/9/c/279cefb4/SB0218.314_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/9/1/a1910cc5/SB0218.317_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback