IN SB0218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Watercraft accidents. Provides that an operator of a boat who is involved in an accident or collision resulting in injury to or death of a person or damage to a boat or other property (operator) shall: (1) if it can be done without endangering a person, stop the boat immediately and as close as possible to the scene of the accident; and (2) if it can be done without endangering a person, return to the scene of the accident and remain there until the operator has complied with the statutory requirements concerning watercraft accidents. Specifies that the operator shall notify emergency services in addition to providing reasonable assistance to each person injured. Requires that an operator make a reasonable and good faith effort to assist a person injured in a collision. Provides, however, that an operator is not required to perform an act that would endanger a person.
Title
Watercraft accidents. Provides that an operator of a boat who is involved in an accident or collision resulting in injury to or death of a person or damage to a boat or other property (operator) shall: (1) if it can be done without endangering a person, stop the boat immediately and as close as possible to the scene of the accident; and (2) if it can be done without endangering a person, return to the scene of the accident and remain there until the operator has complied with the statutory requirements concerning watercraft accidents. Specifies that the operator shall notify emergency services in addition to providing reasonable assistance to each person injured. Requires that an operator make a reasonable and good faith effort to assist a person injured in a collision. Provides, however, that an operator is not required to perform an act that would endanger a person.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2019-01-15 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |