IN SB0217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senator Crider added as third author
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Behavioral health and addiction services. Makes an appropriation to the integrated behavioral health and addiction treatment development program account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral health and addiction services. Makes an appropriation to the integrated behavioral health and addiction treatment development program account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSenator Crider added as third author
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback