IN SB0214 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Low income housing. Reinstates provisions that were repealed in the 2016 session in Senate Bill 309 regarding eligibility for the property tax exemption for improvements on real property that are constructed, rehabilitated, or acquired for the purpose of providing low income housing. Provides that payments in lieu of taxes (PILOTS) may be required from a property owner claiming such an exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low income housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenatePublic Law 74
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 316: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Porter added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Leonard
2021-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateSenators Raatz and Qaddoura added as coauthors
2021-02-11SenateSenator Buchanan added as second author
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy.
2021-02-11SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/214/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/8/5/aa850cb2/SB0214.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/3/8/2638e834/SB0214.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/a/2/79a2adc8/SB0214.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/d/c/cddce5d0/SB0214.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/b/a/42baf4c9/SB0214.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/3/f093ec7b/SB0214.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/e/4/89e415af/SB0214.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/9/d9c9ae51/SB0214.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/4/7/1847fb51/SB0214.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/c/d/7fcd7fe9/SB0214.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/6/5/346512d4/SB0214.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/f/c/4ffc7618/SB0214.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/3/4/f5341985/SB0214.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/a/0/b3a09502/SB0214.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/2/7/5427d954/SB0214.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/6/7/6b67c4d1/SB0214.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/1/2/ee12a90b/SB0214.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/3/e/3e3e41c9/SB0214.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/9/d8b94f45/SB0214.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/6/d/386d10c5/SB0214.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/a/f/c2afdde1/SB0214.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/2/f/a02f0754/SB0214.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/0/b/980b650c/SB0214.138_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/6/0/d7605755/SB0214.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/4/c/c44c5733/SB0214.293_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/7/621795a0/SB0214.316_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback