IN SB0212 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Inmates and Medicaid. Makes the department of correction (department) an inmate's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for inmates who are potentially eligible for Medicaid and who incur medical care expenses that are not otherwise reimbursable. Requires the department and the office of the secretary of family and social services to enter into an agreement in which the department pays the state share of the Medicaid costs incurred for the inmate. Makes the sheriff the individual's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for individuals subject to lawful detention who are potentially eligible for Medicaid. Requires a sheriff to enter into
Title
Inmates and Medicaid. Makes the department of correction (department) an inmate's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for inmates who are potentially eligible for Medicaid and who incur medical care expenses that are not otherwise reimbursable. Requires the department and the office of the secretary of family and social services to enter into an agreement in which the department pays the state share of the Medicaid costs incurred for the inmate. Makes the sheriff the individual's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for individuals subject to lawful detention who are potentially eligible for Medicaid. Requires a sheriff to enter into
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Representatives Brown, T. and Brown, C. added as cosponsors |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Representative Clere added as sponsor |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |