IN SB0212 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee for study during the 2014 legislative interim the topics of: (1) statewide standards for sewage disposal systems, including septic tanks and related facilities and devices; and (2) sewage disposal systems using alternative technologies that offer performance superior to that of traditional sewage disposal systems.
Title
Study of standards for septic systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021201 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021201 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Wolkins added first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 106: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mark Stoops |