IN SB0212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) to amend its rules concerning utility facility relocation to require utilities to provide contact information for authorized representatives for purposes of highway and local improvement projects. Requires INDOT to publish and update an electronic database of authorized utility representatives for purposes of utility facility relocation. Urges the legislative council to assign to the regulatory flexibility committee the task of studying utility facility relocation in local improvement projects.
Title
Utility facility relocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-14 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-13 | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Cherry | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senators Randolph and Kruse added as coauthors | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Leising added as second author | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Gard |