IN SB0210 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's license reinstatement fees. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to administer an amnesty program to reduce reinstatement fees for suspended driving privileges, and establishes criteria for the program. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the prospective reduction of reinstatement fees; (2) the establishment of an insurance program to provide funding to insurance carriers to reduce the automobile insurance premium costs of individuals whose annual household income does not exceed 200% of the federal income poverty level; and (3) the topic of evaluating whether the amount of liability insurance (or other evidence of financial responsibility) required for operation of a motor vehicle is adequate and appropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license reinstatement fees. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to administer an amnesty program to reduce reinstatement fees for suspended driving privileges, and establishes criteria for the program. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the prospective reduction of reinstatement fees; (2) the establishment of an insurance program to provide funding to insurance carriers to reduce the automobile insurance premium costs of individuals whose annual household income does not exceed 200% of the federal income poverty level; and (3) the topic of evaluating whether the amount of liability insurance (or other evidence of financial responsibility) required for operation of a motor vehicle is adequate and appropriate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Mahan
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Shackleford
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 39, nays 10
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #3 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-14SenateSenators Tallian and Sandlin added as coauthors
2019-01-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-08SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Taylor G

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/210/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/c/0/09c00eb5/SB0210.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/3/1/5031d8e6/SB0210.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/6/a/fb6ab934/SB0210.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/9/2/269274e7/SB0210.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/b/0/a9b0aee4/SB0210.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/4/a/3d4a833a/SB0210.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/d/4/2bd4bd36/SB0210.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/7/7/f8770cd3/SB0210.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/7/7b37c11b/SB0210.05.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/5/d1c5c0f7/SB0210.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/5/5/9a551967/SB0210.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/7/6/b9762d61/SB0210.219.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback