IN SB0210 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prior authorization. Specifies requirements for prior authorization of health plan coverage and claim payment, including provisions concerning electronic transmission of prior authorization requests and responses, except in certain circumstances.
Title
Prior authorization. Specifies requirements for prior authorization of health plan coverage and claim payment, including provisions concerning electronic transmission of prior authorization requests and responses, except in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2018-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |