IN SB0209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Indiana University Purdue University Fort Wayne.
Title
Indiana University Purdue University Fort Wayne.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senator Banks added as second author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as first author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |