IN SB0208 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oocyte cryopreservation. Amends the definition of "qualified third party" to "qualified egg bank". Specifies qualifications for a physician overseeing medical services related to oocyte cryopreservation. Specifies requirements that must be met by a fertility clinic or an entity in order to be considered a qualified egg bank. Exempts from the criminal penalty of unlawful transfer of a human organism the payment to or receipt by a qualified egg bank of an amount for: (1) the retrieval of a human ovum; (2) the cryopreservation of a human ovum; (3) the transportation of a human ovum; or (4) other aspects of specified

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oocyte cryopreservation. Amends the definition of "qualified third party" to "qualified egg bank". Specifies qualifications for a physician overseeing medical services related to oocyte cryopreservation. Specifies requirements that must be met by a fertility clinic or an entity in order to be considered a qualified egg bank. Exempts from the criminal penalty of unlawful transfer of a human organism the payment to or receipt by a qualified egg bank of an amount for: (1) the retrieval of a human ovum; (2) the cryopreservation of a human ovum; (3) the transportation of a human ovum; or (4) other aspects of specified

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-17SenateRepresentatives Brown, T. and Brown, C. added as cosponsors
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative Bacon added as sponsor
2015-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 31, nays 19
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-13SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Patricia

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback