IN SB0208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the attorney general to withhold from disclosure certain personal information contained in a report or claim for unclaimed property. Requires unclaimed property held in a safe deposit box to be delivered to the attorney general not later than 30 days after the property is reported to the attorney general. (Current law prohibits the property from being delivered to the attorney general until 120 days after the property is reported.) Provides that an owner of interest bearing property is entitled to receive interest that accrues after the date the property is delivered to the attorney general. Corrects an internal reference.
Title
Unclaimed property.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Rep. John Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 020802 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 020801 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 020802 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 020801 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 56 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 356: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 251: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | SB 208 Amendment #1 (Heaton), prevailed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Price added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Heaton added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 105: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as second author. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Greg Walker |