IN SB0208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that, for purposes of the public intoxication statute, a person is not in a public place or place of public resort if the person is a passenger in a motor vehicle that is traveling on a highway. Specifies that the offense of being intoxicated on a vehicle used for public transportation does not apply to a taxicab.
Title
Public intoxication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Senator M. Young added as second author | |
2011-01-25 | Senator M. Young removed as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Cosponsor: Rep. Pryor | |
2011-01-25 | House sponsor: Rep. Dermody | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 36 and nays 13 | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senators M. Young and Steele added as coauthors | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Taylor |