IN SB0208 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for each year, a solid waste management district's proposed property tax levy and proposed budget must be approved by a majority vote of all members of the board after the board holds a public hearing, and specifies that the district's proposed property tax levy and proposed budget are subject to review and approval under the statutes concerning county council review of budgets and levies of entities with nonelected governing bodies. Provides that in the case where all but one of the counties participating in a joint district have withdrawn from the joint district or have been removed from the joint district, the county that did not withdraw or was not removed from the joint district must designate itself as a new county district, join one or more other counties to form a new joint district, or join an existing joint district. Specifies that the following apply if such a county does not join or form a joint district: (1) The county must designate itself as a new county district and shall be treated as a new county district. (2) The district must, after a public hearing, adopt and submit to the commissioner of the department of environmental management for approval a new district solid waste management plan. (3) The district must, after a public hearing, adopt a new budget for the district. (4) If the district will impose property taxes in the following year, the county fiscal body must approve the use of property taxes. (5) The board of the district shall appoint and convene a new solid waste management advisory committee. Specifies that a district may impose a fee only if the district board holds a public hearing in the calendar year immediately preceding the first year in which the fee will be imposed and then approves the fees by a majority vote of all members of the board. Requires consolidation of public hearings if imposition of both property taxes and fees is proposed. Reinstates the exemption for Marion County from regulation or control under the solid waste management district statutes governing the management of solid waste activities and the collection of fees on the disposal of solid waste in a final disposal facility. (The exemption expired December 2, 2008, under current law.) Provides that the exemption does not apply to a statute concerning fees imposed on the disposal or incineration of solid waste in a final disposal facility and the deposit of those fees in the state solid waste management fund.
Title
Solid waste management district funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Wolkins | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Crawford | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: Yeas 32 and Nays 18 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Hershman added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Charbonneau added as third author | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 2 (Gard), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Gard), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Gard |