IN SB0207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Representative Bacon added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Representative Bacon added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowners associations and solar power. Prohibits a homeowners association from adopting or enforcing certain rules, covenants, declarations of restrictions, and other governing documents concerning solar energy systems after June 30, 2018.
Title
Homeowners associations and solar power. Prohibits a homeowners association from adopting or enforcing certain rules, covenants, declarations of restrictions, and other governing documents concerning solar energy systems after June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Speedy |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 36, nays 12 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |