IN SB0207 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Resident tuition rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resident tuition rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 180
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 497: yeas 34, nays 15
2013-04-17SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 485: yeas 70, nays 23
2013-04-11HouseAmendment 3 (Austin), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-02-26SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2013-02-26SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-02-26SenateCosponsor: Rep. Candelaria Reardon
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Kubacki
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 35 and nays 15
2013-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2013-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-14SenateSenators Mrvan and Taylor added as coauthors
2013-02-07SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senators Leising and Yoder

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback