IN SB0205 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Regional water, sewage, and solid waste districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional water, sewage, and solid waste districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 179
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-15SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2013-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 472: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-04-11SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-08HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 434: yeas 93, nays 1
2013-04-04HouseRepresentative Frye added as cosponsor
2013-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2013-02-25SenateSenators Eckerty and Waltz added as coauthors
2013-02-25SenateCosponsor: Rep. Zent
2013-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Wolkins
2013-02-25SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 50 and nays 0
2013-02-21SenateSenator Randolph added as third author
2013-02-21SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2013-02-21SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor
2013-02-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback