IN SB0204 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sewer connections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sewer connections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 178
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 471: yeas 39, nays 10
2013-04-11SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-08HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 75, nays 17
2013-04-04HouseRepresentative Frye added as cosponsor
2013-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2013-02-04SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2013-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Wolkins
2013-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 40 and nays 9
2013-01-31SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2013-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback