IN SB0203 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

High ability students and education studies. Removes the topic of the department of education's responsibility for licensing teachers from the list of statutes that the legislative council is urged to assign to a study committee during the 2021 legislative interim. Removes the topic of high ability students (including high ability curriculum) from the list of statutes that the legislative council is urged to assign to a study committee during the 2021 legislative interim. Adds certain education topics to the list of statutes that the legislative council is urged to assign to a study committee during the 2023 legislative interim. Removes an expired proposed study topic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High ability students and education studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2021-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-02SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateCosponsors: Representatives Teshka J and Pfaff
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative DeVon
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-26SenateSenators Donato, Crane, Baldwin S, Leising, Walker K added as coauthors
2021-01-26SenateSenator Buchanan added as third author
2021-01-26SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2021-01-25SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2021-01-14SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Rogers

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/203/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/5/b/de5be249/SB0203.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/8/e/f58eda2c/SB0203.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/6/8/aa68fff9/SB0203.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/d/7/b6d76c90/SB0203.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/0/d/e00de026/SB0203.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/7/4/ad74f62c/SB0203.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/0/9/86093089/SB0203.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/1/4/5014c8c8/SB0203.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/e/1/39e13252/SB0203.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/9/c/719cecee/SB0203.50_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback