IN SB0201 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Operating while intoxicated. Provides a defense to prosecution for a person who operates a vehicle with marijuana or its metabolite in the person's blood under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operating while intoxicated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenatePublic Law 49
2021-04-15SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 87, nays 7
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-09HouseRepresentative Ledbetter C added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Lucas
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 29, nays 20
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-11SenateSenator Tallian added as third author
2021-02-11SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/201/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/0/b/e90b1de8/SB0201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/1/5/74159688/SB0201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/a/6/cfa6918f/SB0201.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/0/3/7703b676/SB0201.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/a/f/3eaf30f1/SB0201.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/6/d/ee6d938c/SB0201.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/9/c/279c4330/SB0201.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/e/6/e7e66ba8/SB0201.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/7/8/3e78d022/SB0201.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/1/3/8813490b/SB0201.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/1/8/d418cc93/SB0201.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/1/b/0b1b2f67/SB0201.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/3/c/ff3cee57/SB0201.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/d/ea6dd39e/SB0201.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/f/2/1ef27b35/SB0201.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/1/d/7a1de018/SB0201.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/c/3/c1c3c2b8/SB0201.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/5/b/fc5bc8d0/SB0201.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/1/9/5819abaf/SB0201.181_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/4/2bc48523/SB0201.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/e/f/12efd098/SB0201.292_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback