IN SB0200 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Noncompliant prosecuting attorney. Permits the attorney general to request the appointment of a special prosecuting attorney if a prosecuting attorney is categorically refusing to prosecute certain crimes, and establishes a procedure for the appointment of a person to serve as a special prosecuting attorney to prosecute cases that the county prosecuting attorney is refusing to prosecute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncompliant prosecuting attorney.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 29, nays 20
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 144: yeas 15, nays 34
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-15SenateSenator Sandlin added as coauthor
2021-02-11SenateSenator Freeman added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/200/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/3/5/603598df/SB0200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/9/c/499c88df/SB0200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/7/b/517b37d1/SB0200.02.COMS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/7/6/1d762e81/SB0200.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/9/8/22981067/SB0200.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/a/9/bba9e488/SB0200.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/9/d/ce9d8776/SB0200.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/a/8/03a8bfef/SB0200.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/2/2/3022cf3d/SB0200.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/a/5/bda5c707/SB0200.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/a/01ea3dc7/SB0200.144_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/a/d/54ad1f15/SB0200.180_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback