IN SB0199 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Permits and certain expenses related to alcoholic beverages. Defines "entertainment", "gift", and "professional and educational expenses", and specifies that certain prohibitions that apply to alcoholic beverage permittees concerning gifts do not apply to entertainment or professional and educational expenses, if the provision of entertainment or professional and educational expenses is not exclusionary. Defines "advertising specialty" and "consumer advertising specialty", and voids certain rules of the alcohol and tobacco commission that relate to advertising specialties and consumer advertising specialties. Increases, from four days to seven days, the number of days in a calendar month that may be designated as guest days

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits and certain expenses related to alcoholic beverages. Defines "entertainment", "gift", and "professional and educational expenses", and specifies that certain prohibitions that apply to alcoholic beverage permittees concerning gifts do not apply to entertainment or professional and educational expenses, if the provision of entertainment or professional and educational expenses is not exclusionary. Defines "advertising specialty" and "consumer advertising specialty", and voids certain rules of the alcohol and tobacco commission that relate to advertising specialties and consumer advertising specialties. Increases, from four days to seven days, the number of days in a calendar month that may be designated as guest days

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 43, nays 6
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-06SenateSenator Tallian added as second author
2017-02-06SenateSenator Alting added as author
2017-02-06SenateSenator Long removed as author
2017-02-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Public Policy
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/199/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/3/c/663c1ac9/SB0199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/4/d/b04d0d86/SB0199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/f/d/e2fd5b5c/SB0199.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/0/e/0c0ebcd6/SB0199.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/0/4/e90401bc/SB0199.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/1/5/2915c2ad/SB0199.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/b/3/57b3e2fc/SB0199.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/8/6a189074/SB0199.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/3/2/3132d9f2/SB0199.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/5/7/23577abe/SB0199.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/e/1/73e12912/SB0199.219.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/c/8/17c884b7/SB0199.04.ENGS.04.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback