IN SB0198 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representative Young J added as sponsor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Rioting. Grants, until January 1, 2025, the attorney general concurrent jurisdiction with the prosecuting attorney to prosecute an action in which a person is accused of committing a criminal offense while a member of an unlawful assembly. Permits the chief executive officer of a political subdivision to establish a curfew under certain circumstances. Makes refusing to leave a location in violation of a curfew, after having been informed of the curfew and ordered to leave by a law enforcement officer, a Class B misdemeanor. Allows for the civil forfeiture of property that is used by a person to finance a crime committed by a person who is a member of an unlawful assembly. Prohibits a person from being released on bail without a hearing in open court, establishes a rebuttable presumption that money bail shall be required, and requires a court to consider whether bail conditions more stringent than the local guidelines should be imposed. Adds enhanced penalties to the crimes of: (1) rioting; and (2) obstruction of traffic. Allows a conspiracy charge for a misdemeanor committed while a member of an unlawful assembly. Provides that a person may recover actual damages in a civil action against a county, city, or town (unit) for loss of property proximately caused by an unlawful assembly, if the unit recklessly fails to exercise reasonable diligence to prevent or suppress the unlawful assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rioting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseRepresentative Young J added as sponsor
2021-03-09HouseRepresentative Behning removed as sponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2021-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-16SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2021-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 37, nays 8
2021-02-15SenateSenator Sandlin added as coauthor
2021-02-15SenateSenator Messmer added as coauthor
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 36, nays 8
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateSenator Freeman added as coauthor
2021-02-11SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenator Grooms added as second author
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/198/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/f/4/88f4a370/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/8/1/5581b8c8/SB0198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/0/f/030fe1ff/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/4/a/1d4a7290/SB0198.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/f/7/00f7b4f6/SB0198.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/2/6/0b26001b/SB0198.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/d/5/6bd55dc1/SB0198.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/f/4/64f4a0a7/SB0198.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/a/e/5eae4b7b/SB0198.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/d/f/06df2c14/SB0198.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/5/5/1b554463/SB0198.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/4/3/1e436e22/SB0198.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/c/a/bcca18c7/SB0198.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/5/9/d2598011/SB0198.123_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback