IN SB0197 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal law issues. Specifies that a conviction for certain sex offenses requires mandatory revocation of a teaching license. Provides that bail provisions that apply to persons on probation and parole also apply to persons on community supervision. Removes and replaces certain references to "official investigations", "official proceedings", and methods of reporting. Adds to the crime of resisting law enforcement the act of forcibly resisting, refusing, obstructing, or interfering with a law enforcement officer's lawful: (1) entry into a structure; or (2) order to exit a structure. Provides that all Level 1 and Level 2 felonies may be prosecuted at any time. Repeals synthetic identity deception and consolidates it with identity deception. Makes attempted murder a predicate offense for the use of a firearm sentence enhancement. Makes certain changes to the definition of "substantially similar" for purposes of the controlled substance law. Adds controlled substance analogs to certain statutes prohibiting controlled substances in penal facilities. Replaces references to delta-9 THC with THC. Repeals and consolidates various fraud and deception offenses. Defines "financial institution" for purposes of crimes involving financial institutions. Defines "pecuniary loss" for purposes of fraud in connection with insurance. Repeals or decriminalizes certain infrequently charged misdemeanors. Makes fraud a Level 4 felony if the amount involved is at least $100,000. Defines attempted murder as a "serious violent felony". Amends the definition of "emergency medical services provider" for the offense of battery to include a staff member in the emergency department of a hospital. Provides a procedure for a law enforcement officer to request a blood sample if the law enforcement officer has probable cause to believe that a person has committed the offense of operating a vehicle or motorboat while intoxicated causing: (1) serious bodily injury; or (2) death or catastrophic injury. Provides that the law enforcement training board may establish certain standards for training programs. Resolves technical conflicts with SEA 81, HEA 1006, and HEA 1564. Makes technical corrections. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal law issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-16SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2021-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 45, nays 0
2021-02-15SenateSenator Sandlin added as second author
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #5 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/6/9/4b69c7ce/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/6/a/ae6a2912/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/4/6/b8469690/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/6/c/1a6c481c/SB0197.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/9/e/899e0c98/SB0197.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/4/0/8c40d5b5/SB0197.04.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/1/f/0d1ff217/SB0197.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/d/5/65d54375/SB0197.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/4/1/7d413ed0/SB0197.02.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/8/6/968601f5/SB0197.02.COMS.AMS004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/e/c/d3ec740a/SB0197.02.COMS.AMS005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/a/e/5bae334d/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/c/7b3c74d8/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/2/f/8e2fc7ba/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/f/7/13f7e667/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/9/5/03954ea5/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/6/3/ec6396db/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/5/1/72516dd6/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH007.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/0/4/dc043c7f/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH008.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/e/3/bbe352e8/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH009.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/f/c/2bfc0644/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH010.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/a/8f2a42c1/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH011.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/7/a/ce7ab0e4/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH012.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/6/8/22687466/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH013.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/9/1/29910ce4/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH014.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/3/3/e5331797/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH015.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/9/b/359b9506/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH016.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/d/d54d3009/SB0197.04.COMH.AMH017.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/1/4/25147b12/SB0197.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/0/d/bc0d42d8/SB0197.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/2/2/0b220513/SB0197.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/8/4/e384470b/SB0197.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/4/5/14459f0a/SB0197.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/5/d/755d93ca/SB0197.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/2/2/7922652c/SB0197.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/1/1/3f115fe8/SB0197.01.INTR.08.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/7/e/817ea47e/SB0197.122_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/a/3/cba3689c/SB0197.03.ENGS.00.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback