IN SB0196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Requires the state board of education (state board) to adopt administrative rules to allow an organization to provide credit under a Core 40 curriculum model for alternative programs in which students obtain credit counting toward the student's graduation requirements from nonschool educational experience that applies or incorporates content area knowledge in lieu of a required or elective course in the Core 40 curriculum model.
Title
Education matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Law 73 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 315: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeVon |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cook |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 13, nays 34 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |