IN SB0196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School debt service obligations. Provides the following for purposes of the school bond payment intercept statute: (1) The term "debt service obligations" also includes principal and interest payable to a school corporation's designated paying agent under a written agreement entered into in connection with the issuance of a school corporation's general obligation bonds. (2) Upon being notified of a school corporation's failure to pay debt service obligations when due, the treasurer of state shall within five days pay the unpaid debt service obligations that are due from state funds, in an amount equal to the amount of the unpaid debt
Title
School debt service obligations. Provides the following for purposes of the school bond payment intercept statute: (1) The term "debt service obligations" also includes principal and interest payable to a school corporation's designated paying agent under a written agreement entered into in connection with the issuance of a school corporation's general obligation bonds. (2) Upon being notified of a school corporation's failure to pay debt service obligations when due, the treasurer of state shall within five days pay the unpaid debt service obligations that are due from state funds, in an amount equal to the amount of the unpaid debt
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 167 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 473: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 408: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor |
2017-03-06 | House | Representative Huston added as cosponsor |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Goodin |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as author |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |