IN SB0195 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
1977 pension and disability fund study. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on pension management oversight or another appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) an increase in the monthly benefit paid to a surviving spouse of a 1977 fund member who dies other than in the line of duty; and (2) the process by which a 1977 fund member is determined to be entitled to receive a disability benefit, including the advisability of using a single independent review board for disability determinations.
Title
1977 pension and disability fund study. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on pension management oversight or another appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) an increase in the monthly benefit paid to a surviving spouse of a 1977 fund member who dies other than in the line of duty; and (2) the process by which a 1977 fund member is determined to be entitled to receive a disability benefit, including the advisability of using a single independent review board for disability determinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] |
Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Olthoff and Aylesworth |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Slager |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |