IN SB0194 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Voter challenges in primaries. Eliminates voter challenges at a primary election based on party affiliation.
Title
Voter challenges in primaries. Eliminates voter challenges at a primary election based on party affiliation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Wesco |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |