IN SB0192 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Guardianship and adult protective services report. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee a study of the visitation, communication, and interaction with a protected person. Requires the family and social services administration (FSSA), in cooperation with the Indiana prosecuting attorneys council (IPAC), to prepare and submit a report to the legislative council before December 1, 2016, concerning adult protective services. Specifies that the report must include: (1) an estimation of appropriate staffing levels necessary to efficiently and effectively manage the investigations of reports of matters related to the abuse, neglect, or exploitation of endangered adults; (2) identification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianship and adult protective services report. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee a study of the visitation, communication, and interaction with a protected person. Requires the family and social services administration (FSSA), in cooperation with the Indiana prosecuting attorneys council (IPAC), to prepare and submit a report to the legislative council before December 1, 2016, concerning adult protective services. Specifies that the report must include: (1) an estimation of appropriate staffing levels necessary to efficiently and effectively manage the investigations of reports of matters related to the abuse, neglect, or exploitation of endangered adults; (2) identification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21SenatePublic Law 34
2016-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-25SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 229: yeas 44, nays 1
2016-02-24SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-02-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 100, nays 0
2016-02-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-18HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2016-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-09HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as cosponsor
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2016-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-02SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as third author
2016-02-02SenateCosponsor: Representative Brown, T.
2016-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative DeVon
2016-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28SenateSenators Steele, Head, Randolph added as coauthors
2016-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-25SenateSenator Kenley added as second author
2016-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/192/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/4/1/00411030/SB0192.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/6/3256f606/SB0192.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/7/5/fd756e85/SB0192.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/9/c/d19cb14f/SB0192.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/1/4/2214ff10/SB0192.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/2/0/0620cf11/SB0192.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/f/6/8ef62178/SB0192.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/6/d/2d6dbc61/SB0192.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/a/9/91a95ed7/SB0192.134.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/a/1/d1a10f20/SB0192.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/8/8/fa88ceee/SB0192.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/2/4/4e246fc6/SB0192.229.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback