IN SB0191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Historic preservation and rehabilitation grants. Provides that for purposes of the historic preservation and rehabilitation grant program, the term "person" includes a nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation. Provides that the office of community and rural affairs may award a grant under the program to a nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation if the historic property will be used by the nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation for the organization's or corporation's purposes and functions. Increases the maximum amount of a preservation or rehabilitation grant (grant) from 35% to 50% of qualified expenditures, not to exceed the grant ceiling in current law of $100,000. Provides that a person is eligible for a grant if the qualified expenditures for preserving or rehabilitating the historic property exceed $5,000 (instead of $10,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic preservation and rehabilitation grants. Provides that for purposes of the historic preservation and rehabilitation grant program, the term "person" includes a nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation. Provides that the office of community and rural affairs may award a grant under the program to a nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation if the historic property will be used by the nonprofit organization or nonprofit corporation for the organization's or corporation's purposes and functions. Increases the maximum amount of a preservation or rehabilitation grant (grant) from 35% to 50% of qualified expenditures, not to exceed the grant ceiling in current law of $100,000. Provides that a person is eligible for a grant if the qualified expenditures for preserving or rehabilitating the historic property exceed $5,000 (instead of $10,000).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenatePublic Law 16
2019-04-10SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-13HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Fleming added as cosponsor
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2019-03-12HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-03-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Abbott D added as cosponsor
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateCosponsor: Representative Heaton
2019-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Morrison
2019-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Grooms added as third author
2019-02-04SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Ford Jon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/191/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/4/8/29487ecb/SB0191.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/3/a/093a7c0b/SB0191.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/8/f/f28f9f0b/SB0191.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/a/4/59a48051/SB0191.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/1/1/10118afa/SB0191.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/3/8/1f38ce4d/SB0191.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/1/e/501e8a26/SB0191.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/5/1/6e513f0d/SB0191.79.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/3/d/ba3da879/SB0191.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/d/4/3bd4463d/SB0191.310.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/6/5/c665324c/SB0191.345.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback