IN SB0191 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a political subdivision to authorize its investing officer to invest public funds for a maximum term of five years. (Under current law, the maximum term is generally two years.) Requires the fiscal body of the political subdivision to approve a written investment policy and adopt an ordinance to provide this authority. Provides that the authority expires on the date of the expiration of the policy which may not exceed four years. Limits the amount that may be invested for more than two years to 25% of the political subdivision's total portfolio of public fund investments, including transaction accounts. Changes population parameters to reflect the population count determined under the 2010 decennial census.
Title
Local government investments.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] |
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Reassigned to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Tallian added as coauthor | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Buck added as third author | |
2012-01-19 | Cosponsor: Rep. Moseley | |
2012-01-19 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Eckerty added as second author | |
2012-01-17 | Amendment 1 (Charbonneau), prevailed; | |
2012-01-17 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |