IN SB0190 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Value of property. Provides that, with respect to an offense with a penalty that may be enhanced due to the value of the property involved in the offense: (1) if the offense is committed within a 30 day period all offenses may be charged in a single count; and (2) if the offenses are charged in a single count, the value of the property involved in the offenses may be aggregated.
Title
Value of property. Provides that, with respect to an offense with a penalty that may be enhanced due to the value of the property involved in the offense: (1) if the offense is committed within a 30 day period all offenses may be charged in a single count; and (2) if the offenses are charged in a single count, the value of the property involved in the offenses may be aggregated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 166 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 39, nays 7 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Dissent withdrawn |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, Young J and Pierce |
2017-04-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and DeLaney |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Lanane and Freeman |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 394: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Washburne added as sponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 43, nays 4 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |