IN SB0190 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Senator Randolph removed as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Senator Randolph removed as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that taking an adverse employment action against an employee because that employee lawfully opposed or attempted to oppose a practice that is unlawful under civil rights enforcement laws is a discriminatory practice. Requires the board for the coordination of programs serving vulnerable individuals (board) to: (1) review and make recommendations regarding certain state agencies contracting with minority operated nonprofit organizations; and (2) develop a plan to increase the number of contracts between certain state agencies and minority operated nonprofit organizations. Reconciles conflicting language about the board's reporting duties.
Title
Discriminatory practice definition and board for the coordination of programs serving vulnerable individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Senator Randolph removed as advisor | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Tallian removed as conferee | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Skinner added as advisor | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Randolph added as conferee | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Randolph removed as advisor | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Tallian removed as conferee | |
2010-02-25 | House advisor appointed: Niezgodski and Bell | |
2010-02-25 | House conferees appointed: V. Smith and Steuerwald | |
2010-02-22 | Senate advisors appointed: Buck, Randolph and M. Young | |
2010-02-22 | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian | |
2010-02-22 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: Yeas 59, Nays 35 | |
2010-02-16 | Amendment 3 (V. Smith), failed; Roll Call 170: Yeas 39, Nays 51 | |
2010-02-16 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-09 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment | |
2010-01-21 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Senator M. Young added as second author | |
2010-01-21 | House sponsor: Rep. V. Smith | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-19 | Senators Buck and Tallian added as coauthors | |
2010-01-19 | Amendment 1 (M. Young), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Boots |