IN SB0188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing faculty loan repayment grant program. Establishes the nursing faculty loan repayment grant program (program) to increase the number of nursing faculty in Indiana. Requires the commission for higher education to administer the program. Establishes the nursing faculty loan repayment grant fund. Sets forth requirements for an individual to participate in the program. Adds a ten dollar nurse licensing fee to fund the program.
Title
Nursing faculty loan repayment grant program. Establishes the nursing faculty loan repayment grant program (program) to increase the number of nursing faculty in Indiana. Requires the commission for higher education to administer the program. Establishes the nursing faculty loan repayment grant fund. Sets forth requirements for an individual to participate in the program. Adds a ten dollar nurse licensing fee to fund the program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere, Sullivan and Bacon |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Leising |