IN SB0187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety matters. Provides that a unit shall provide by ordinance the number of police reserve officers a law enforcement agency may appoint. Provides that the law enforcement training board may revoke, suspend, modify, or restrict a document showing compliance and qualifications for a unit's police reserve officer who has committed misconduct. Provides that a law enforcement agency hiring a police reserve officer must contact every other law enforcement agency that employed (or employs) the applicant and request the applicant's employment file and disciplinary record. Provides that a special law enforcement officer employed by the city of Indianapolis full time after June 30, 2023, to perform park ranger duties (park ranger) is subject to the same training requirements as regular law enforcement officers. Provides that the facilities of the Indiana law enforcement academy must be used to provide a park ranger with the required basic training.
Title
Public safety matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 3 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 3 (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 3 (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 173 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 3: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 502: yeas 41, nays 7 |
2023-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 3: adopted by the House; Roll Call 521: yeas 80, nays 13 |
2023-04-26 | House | CCR # 3 filed in the House |
2023-04-26 | House | CCR # 2 filed in the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | CCR # 3 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Motion to withdraw CCR #2: prevailed |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Smaltz added as conferee |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Speedy removed as conferee |
2023-04-26 | Senate | CCR # 2 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Motion to withdraw CCR #1: prevailed |
2023-04-25 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as conferee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senator Taylor G removed as conferee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senator Freeman removed as advisor |
2023-04-24 | House | Representative Davis added as conferee |
2023-04-24 | House | Representative Pack removed as conferee |
2023-04-24 | House | Representative Davis removed as advisor |
2023-04-19 | House | House advisors appointed: Davis, Payne and Gore |
2023-04-19 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Pack |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Pol and Freeman |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Sandlin and Taylor G |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-18 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 426: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-13 | House | Amendment #1 (Speedy) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | Representative Lauer added as cosponsor |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor |
2023-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2023-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |