IN SB0186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares the state policy on agriculture and farmers' rights.
Title
State policy on agriculture and farmers' rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Roll Call 018602 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 018601 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Roll Call 018602 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 018601 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 25 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 250: yeas 67 and nays 30 |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | House | SB 186 Amendment #1 (Saunders), failed. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Banks added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Kubacki added aso cosponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Friend added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Lehe added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 40 and nays 8 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder. |