IN SB0185 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Senators Ford Jon and Qaddoura added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Newborn safety device. Modifies the newborn safety device requirements that apply to a fire department. Makes conforming changes to the immunity provisions applicable to the places at which a newborn safety device may be located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newborn safety device.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateSenators Ford Jon and Qaddoura added as coauthors
2022-01-18SenateSenator Houchin added as second author
2022-01-18SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-11SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2022-01-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2022-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/185/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/b/5/a9b53915/SB0185.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/7/d/8a7db68d/SB0185.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/8/0/7680137b/SB0185.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/6/d/df6d1b66/SB0185.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/0/0/2e00362b/SB0185.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/4/3/3d434c2c/SB0185.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/e/c/54ec05c3/SB0185.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/f/c/5cfc208d/SB0185.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/c/d/1ecdd901/SB0185.01.INTR.02.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback