IN SB0185 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Home based vendors. Requires that the state department of health, state board of animal health, and state department of agriculture shall, in consultation with industry groups and food safety experts, submit recommendations concerning home based vendors to the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home based vendors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 140
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 482: yeas 89, nays 0
2021-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 467: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-15HouseRepresentative Lehe added as conferee
2021-04-15HouseRepresentative Davisson removed as conferee
2021-04-15HouseRepresentative Lehe removed as advisor
2021-04-13SenateSenate advisors appointed: Walker K and Breaux
2021-04-13SenateSenate conferees appointed: Walker G and Lanane
2021-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehe, Ledbetter and Bartlett
2021-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Davisson and Bauer M
2021-04-08SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-08SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-08SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2021-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Ledbetter C added as cosponsor
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2021-03-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2021-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-15SenateCosponsor: Representative Lehe
2021-02-15SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Davisson
2021-02-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-11SenateSenator Walker K added as second author
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-04SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Walker G

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/185/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/8/c/ae8c0376/SB0185.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/4/f/1e4f0f9f/SB0185.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/c/0/1ac07f69/SB0185.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/7/3/93730b6a/SB0185.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/2/0/e820ff05/SB0185.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/5/f/f95ff534/SB0185.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/4/2/ba422519/SB0185.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/5/5c9508a1/SB0185.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/d/1/86d1d75e/SB0185.05.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/c/c/35cc1a57/SB0185.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/7/a/827ad177/SB0185.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/f/c/65fc85ba/SB0185.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/e/4/3be424db/SB0185.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/e/f/0bef1d25/SB0185.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/d/8/4dd8e815/SB0185.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/2/e/4f2ef8f3/SB0185.03.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/9/6/4e9615a9/SB0185.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/d/4/b0d4dbea/SB0185.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/b/2/82b2a554/SB0185.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/b/2/61b25602/SB0185.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/b/d/8fbd6389/SB0185.04.COMH.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/0/3/1903b8b9/SB0185.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/a/2/c8a2a874/SB0185.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/9/7/399774ca/SB0185.108_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/b/4/feb45215/SB0185.03.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/6/a/3e6aba95/SB0185.258_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/3/2/7432080e/SB0185.467_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/b/1/8fb16eff/SB0185.482_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback