IN SB0185 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 10:30 am in Room 156-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sale of companion animals. Prohibits the sale of a companion animal unless the companion animal: (1) is at least eight weeks of age; and (2) has received appropriate vaccinations. Makes a violation a Class C infraction for every animal unlawfully sold, and increases the penalty to a Class B infraction if the person has a prior judgment for an unlawful sale. Defines "unfit for sale" and provides remedies for a person who purchases a companion animal that was unfit for sale or that was the subject of misrepresentations concerning the animal's age or medical history.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of companion animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehe and Klinker
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Negele
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 43, nays 7
2020-01-27SenateAmendment #2 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-23SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2020-01-23SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2020-01-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback