IN SB0184 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Buchanan added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Buchanan added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Residential housing development program. Removes the requirement that the governing body of a school corporation affected by a residential housing development program (program) approve the program by resolution before the program may take effect.
Title
Residential housing development program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |