IN SB0183 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Study committee review of food and beverage taxes. Requires each political subdivision or other entity that imposes a food and beverage tax to annually report information concerning distributions and expenditures of amounts received from the food and beverage tax. Urges the legislative council to assign to the fiscal policy interim study committee the task of conducting a review of each food and beverage tax statute, including: (1) the purposes for which revenue from each food and beverage tax may be used; and (2) the expiration date of each food and beverage tax, if any.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study committee review of food and beverage taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateCosponsor: Representative Goodrich
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 44, nays 5
2020-02-03SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateSenator Rogers added as second author
2020-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Gaskill

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback