IN SB0182 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Representative Bacon added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Adult protective services study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of adult protective service laws to an appropriate study committee during the 2015 interim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult protective services study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of adult protective service laws to an appropriate study committee during the 2015 interim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseRepresentative Bacon added as cosponsor
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-02SenateRepresentatives Mahan and Austin added as cosponsors
2015-02-02SenateRepresentative Ziemke added as sponsor
2015-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 44, nays 0
2015-01-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-26SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2015-01-26SenateSenator Head added as coauthor
2015-01-22SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Lanane

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback