IN SB0182 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commission for higher education to create a common course numbering system, into which each state educational institution shall map its own course numbers, for courses in the core transfer library. Requires state educational institutions to create a statewide transfer general education core to be implemented by May 15, 2013. Provides that an individual who holds an associate degree is considered to have met at least 30 semester credit hours of the general education requirements for a bachelor's degree. Requires a state educational institution to accept an associate degree from another state educational institution as credit toward a related bachelor's degree.
Title
State educational institutions; credit transfers.
Sponsors
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-20 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 91, nays 2 | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-31 | Senators Leising and Delph added as coauthors | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Head added as coauthor | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsors: Reps. Turner, Klinker and Porter | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Rogers added as coauthor | |
2012-01-10 | Senator Kruse added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Banks |