IN SB0178 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Citizenship and immigration status. Provides that, if the attorney general determines probable cause exists, the attorney general, rather than any person lawfully domiciled in Indiana, may bring an action to compel a governmental body or postsecondary educational institution to comply with statutes requiring cooperation with federal immigration officials. Requires a court to apply a preponderance of the evidence standard to enjoin the violation of those statutes.
Title
Citizenship and immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senator Crane added as third author |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |