IN SB0177 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
The Indiana high school diploma. Requires the state board of education (state board) to establish one Indiana diploma for individuals who successfully complete high school graduation requirements. (Current law establishes four different diplomas.) Provides that each Indiana diploma must include one of the following designations: (1) General designation. (2) Core 40 designation. (3) Core 40 with academic honors designation. (4) Core 40 with technical honors designation. Requires, in adopting Core 40 curriculum models, the state board to consider math course requirements other than Algebra II. Allows the state board to adopt rules to establish: (1) math course requirements; and (2)
Title
The Indiana high school diploma. Requires the state board of education (state board) to establish one Indiana diploma for individuals who successfully complete high school graduation requirements. (Current law establishes four different diplomas.) Provides that each Indiana diploma must include one of the following designations: (1) General designation. (2) Core 40 designation. (3) Core 40 with academic honors designation. (4) Core 40 with technical honors designation. Requires, in adopting Core 40 curriculum models, the state board to consider math course requirements other than Algebra II. Allows the state board to adopt rules to establish: (1) math course requirements; and (2)
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Burton, DeVon and Wesco |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |