IN SB0177 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county jail or a department of correction facility to return: (1) certain unused medication to the pharmacy that dispensed the medication; and (2) unused medical devices or medical supplies that are used for prescription drug therapy and that meet specified requirements. Allows a pharmacist or pharmacy that enters into an agreement to accept the return of unused medication, unused medical devices, or unused medical supplies to negotiate a fee for processing the return.
Title
Unused medication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-25 | Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2011-01-25 | House sponsor: Rep. Frizzell | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Grooms added as second author | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Miller |