IN SB0176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescriptions. Allows certain prescriptions to be transmitted electronically. Requires dentists, physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, optometrists, physician assistants, and podiatrists to issue a prescription for a controlled substance in an electronic format and by electronic transmission after December 31, 2020. Provides exceptions to issuing an electronically transmitted prescription for a controlled substance. Requires the Indiana board of pharmacy to adopt rules concerning electronically transmitted prescriptions for controlled substances. Provides that dentists, physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, optometrists, physician assistants, and podiatrists are subject to disciplinary action for violating these provisions. Requires a pharmacy to transfer, upon the request of a patient, a prescription for the patient that the pharmacy has received but not filled to another pharmacy. Sets forth exceptions. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the advantages, disadvantages, and feasibility of requiring health care providers to issue prescriptions in an electronic format and by electronic transmission; and (2) any exceptions that would be needed to a requirement for health care providers to issue prescriptions in an electronic format and by electronic transmission. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescriptions. Allows certain prescriptions to be transmitted electronically. Requires dentists, physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, optometrists, physician assistants, and podiatrists to issue a prescription for a controlled substance in an electronic format and by electronic transmission after December 31, 2020. Provides exceptions to issuing an electronically transmitted prescription for a controlled substance. Requires the Indiana board of pharmacy to adopt rules concerning electronically transmitted prescriptions for controlled substances. Provides that dentists, physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, optometrists, physician assistants, and podiatrists are subject to disciplinary action for violating these provisions. Requires a pharmacy to transfer, upon the request of a patient, a prescription for the patient that the pharmacy has received but not filled to another pharmacy. Sets forth exceptions. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the advantages, disadvantages, and feasibility of requiring health care providers to issue prescriptions in an electronic format and by electronic transmission; and (2) any exceptions that would be needed to a requirement for health care providers to issue prescriptions in an electronic format and by electronic transmission. Makes conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePublic Law 28
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 361: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 322: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Walker added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Houchin added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2019-01-24SenateCosponsors: Representatives Clere and Engleman
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Davisson
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/176/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/0/5/3b05bde3/SB0176.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/3/5/2635aafe/SB0176.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/f/4/59f4ad17/SB0176.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/c/2/97c2395d/SB0176.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/9/e/4a9ee917/SB0176.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/e/8/37e89608/SB0176.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/b/4/5bb4c0a5/SB0176.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/8/8/7f88dec8/SB0176.27.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/f/7/3cf7d04e/SB0176.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/2/7/98271a2b/SB0176.322.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/1/f/a71fe430/SB0176.361.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback